Try sofatutor for 30 Days

Discover why over 1.6 MILLION pupils choose sofatutor!

Multiplying Two-Digit Numbers by Two-Digit Numbers Using an Area Model—Let's Practise

Do you want to learn faster and more easily?

Then why not use our learning videos, and practice for school with learning games.

Try for 30 Days
Rating

Be the first to give a rating!
The authors
Avatar
Team Digital

Basics on the topic Multiplying Two-Digit Numbers by Two-Digit Numbers Using an Area Model—Let's Practise

In this video, practise multiplying 2 digit numbers by 2 digit numbers using the area model.

Transcript Multiplying Two-Digit Numbers by Two-Digit Numbers Using an Area Model—Let's Practise

Razzi says get these items ready because today we're going to practise multiplying two-digit numbers by two-digit numbers using an area model. It's time to begin! Use an area model to solve fifty-one times seventy-nine. Pause the video to work on the problem and press play when you are ready to see the solution! First, set up the area model by labelling the top and left side with each factor written in expanded form. Then multiply, fifty times seventy which equals three thousand five hundred, fifty times nine which equals four hundred and fifty, one times seventy which equals seventy, and one times nine which equals nine. Then, add the partial products. Did you also get four thousand and twenty-nine? Let's tackle the next problem! Use an area model to solve twenty-three times eighty-six. Pause the video to work on the problem and press play when you are ready to see the solution! First, set up the area model by labelling the top and left side with each factor written in expanded form. Then multiply, twenty times eighty which equals one thousand six hundred, twenty times six which equals one hundred and twenty, three times eighty which equals two hundred and forty, and three times six which equals eighteen. Then, add the partial products. Did you also get one thousand nine hundred and seventy-eight? Razzi had so much fun practising with you today! See you next time!

Multiplying Two-Digit Numbers by Two-Digit Numbers Using an Area Model—Let's Practise exercise

Would you like to apply the knowledge you’ve learnt? You can review and practice it with the tasks for the video Multiplying Two-Digit Numbers by Two-Digit Numbers Using an Area Model—Let's Practise .
  • Which option is the correct expanded form of 97?

    Hints

    Remember, expanded form will show each digit expanded into its actual value.

    Look at this example of the number 23 written in expanded form.

    Solution

    The correct way to write the number 97 in expanded form is 90 + 7. To do that we separated the number into the tens digit and the ones digit.

  • Solve 24 x 12.

    Hints

    Remember the steps to solve the problem.

    1) Set up the area model by labelling the top and left side with each factor written in expanded form.

    2) Multiply each square in the area model.

    3) Add the products together.

    Here is the correct area model for this problem to help.

    Solution

    The correct answer is 288.

    In this image, we see all of the multiplication problems done correctly. Then, once we add up all the answers (200 + 40 + 40 + 8), we get the correct answer.

  • Solve 86 x 54.

    Hints

    Remember the steps to solve the problem.

    1) Set up the area model by labelling the top and left side with each factor written in expanded form.

    2) Multiply each square in the area model.

    3) Add the products together.

    Here is the correct area model for this problem to help.

    Solution

    The correct answer is 4,644.

    In this image, we see all of the multiplication problems done correctly. Then, once we add up all the partial products(4,000 + 300 + 320 + 24), we get the correct answer.

  • Solve 79 x 67.

    Hints

    Remember the steps to solve the problem.

    1) Set up the area model by labelling the top and left side with each factor written in expanded form.

    2) Multiply each square in the area model.

    3) Add the products together.

    Here is the correct area model for this problem.

    Solution

    The correct answer is 5,293.

    Here we see all of the multiplication problems done correctly. Then, once we add up all the partial products (4,200 + 540 + 490 + 63), we get the correct answer.

  • Solve 45 x 21.

    Hints

    Remember the steps to solve the problem.

    1) Set up the area model by labelling the top and left side with each factor written in expanded form.

    2) Multiply each square in the area model.

    3) Add the products together.

    Your area model should look like the image.

    Solution

    The correct answer is 945.

    In this image, we see all of the multiplication problems done correctly. Then, once we add up all the answers (800 + 100 + 40 + 5), we get the correct answer.

  • What is 98 x 86?

    Hints

    Remember the steps to solve the problem.

    1) Set up the area model by labelling the top and left side with each factor written in expanded form.

    2) Multiply each square in the area model.

    3) Add the products together.

    The first step of the area problem has been set up correctly in this image.

    Solution

    The correct answer is 8,428.

    In this image, we see all of the multiplication problems done correctly. Then, once we add up all the partial products (7,200 + 640 + 540 + 48), we get the correct answer.